US HB5969 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to revise certain regulations to permit certain children to accompany their parents or legal guardians through Global Entry airport lanes, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving Travel for Families Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2024-03-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-03-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H787)
2024-03-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
2024-03-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5969.
2024-03-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H787-788)
2024-03-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
2024-03-05HouseMr. Green (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2024-03-01HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332.
2024-03-01HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
2024-03-01HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 118-403, Part I.
2023-11-08HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2023-11-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-10-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-10-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security and Enforcement.
2023-10-17HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback