US HB5938 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Veterans' Benefits Improvements Act of 1996 and the Johnny Isakson and David P. Roe, M.D. Veterans Health Care and Benefits Improvement Act of 2020 to improve the temporary licensure requirements for contract health care professionals who perform medical disability examinations for the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Exam Expansion Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492.
2024-07-18HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-592.
2023-12-05HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2023-12-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-11-29HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2023-11-29HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-11-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2023-10-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2023-10-12HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback