US HB5932 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
States that it is U.S. policy to push for greater transparency with respect to financing provided by China to another country through international financial institutions such as the International Monetary Fund. The National Advisory Council on International Monetary and Financial Policies within the Department of the Treasury shall report annually on progress made toward advancing this policy.
Title
Ensuring Chinese Debt Transparency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 80 (Y: 356 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 73) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-03-02 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 356 - 0 (Roll no. 80). (text: CR H1429) |
2020-03-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1433-1434) |
2020-03-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-03-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5932. |
2020-03-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1429-1430) |
2020-03-02 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4629 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
U.S. and foreign investments
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
U.S. and foreign investments