US HB590 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced Nuclear Technology Development Act of 2017 (Sec. 4) This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) and the Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC) to enter into a memorandum of understanding to: ensure that DOE has sufficient technical expertise to support the civilian nuclear industry's timely development and commercial deployment of safe, innovative advanced reactor technology; ensure that the NRC has sufficient technical expertise to support the evaluation of requests for regulatory approval for advanced reactors; use computers and software codes to calculate the behavior and performance of advanced reactors based on mathematical models of their physical behavior; and ensure that the DOE maintains and develops the facilities to support the civilian nuclear industry's timely development and commercial deployment of safe, innovative reactor technology and ensuring that the NRC has access to such facilities, as needed. (Sec. 5) In addition, the NRC is required to develop a regulatory framework for licensing advanced nuclear reactors. The plan must include options to expedite and streamline the licensing process for advanced reactors, cost estimates, budgets, and specific milestones for implementing the framework by the end of FY2019. (Sec. 6) This bill amends the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1990 to require that the aggregate amount of fees collected by the NRC from licensees and certificate holders in a fiscal year be decreased by the amount of appropriations for activities related to the development of regulatory infrastructure for advanced nuclear reactor technologies.
Title
Advanced Nuclear Technology Development Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-01-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H569-570) |
2017-01-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 590. |
2017-01-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H569-571) |
2017-01-23 | House | Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy research
Executive agency funding and structure
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
Research and development
User charges and fees
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy research
Executive agency funding and structure
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
Research and development
User charges and fees