US HB5885 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands certain paid parental leave benefits to include specified public sector employees, including employees of the Federal Aviation Administration and the Transportation Security Administration, the Executive Office of the President and the White House, and the District of Columbia Courts and Public Defender Service.
Title
Federal Employee Parental Leave Technical Correction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Veterans' Affairs, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3104 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S7161-7163)
HB5993 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB5993 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Transportation
District of Columbia
Employee leave
Executive Office of the President
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Transportation
District of Columbia
Employee leave
Executive Office of the President
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5885/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5885/BILLS-116hr5885ih.pdf |