US HB5993 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides employees of the Federal Aviation Administration, the Transportation Security Administration (TSA), and the Veterans Health Administration with the same family and medical leave benefits as other federal employees, beginning in FY2021. The bill also specifies that TSA screeners are eligible to receive family and medical leave benefits beginning in FY2021.
Title
VAlue FAAmily Act
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2020-03-03 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1447) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6036 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB5885 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB3104 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S7161-7163)
HB5885 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB3104 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text: CR S7161-7163)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Transportation
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee leave
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Health personnel
Transportation employees
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Transportation
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee leave
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Health personnel
Transportation employees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5993/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5993/BILLS-116hr5993ih.pdf |