US HB5875 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadens the scope of allowable firearm transactions involving active duty service members and their spouses. Specifically, the bill allows a licensed gun dealer, importer, or manufacturer to sell or ship a firearm or ammunition to the spouse of a member of the Armed Forces on active duty outside the United States. (Current law already allows a licensed dealer, importer, or manufacturer to sell or ship a firearm or ammunition to a member of the Armed Forces on active duty outside the United States.) The bill also specifies that, for purposes of federal firearms laws, a member of the Armed Forces on active duty, or his or her spouse, is a resident of the state in which (1) the member or spouse maintains legal residence, (2) the permanent duty station of the member is located, and (3) the member maintains a home from which he or she commutes to the permanent duty station.
Title
Protect Our Military Families’ 2nd Amendment Rights Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2251 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB3493 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3493 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5875/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5875/BILLS-116hr5875ih.pdf |