US HB584 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal a provision (added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act) that extends to corporations that are not tax-exempt the requirement to report payments of $600 or more. Rescinds $44 billion of appropriated but unobligated discretionary funds. Exempts unobligated funds of the Department of Defense (DOD), the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), or the Social Security Administration. Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to determine and identify from which appropriation accounts such rescissions shall apply and report to the Secretary of the Treasury and Congress on such rescissions.
Title
To repeal the information reporting requirements added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. John Carney [D-DE] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-9.
HB60 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB144 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB584 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB18 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB72 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1885 (Related) 2011-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB60 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB144 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB584 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
SB18 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB72 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1885 (Related) 2011-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Appropriations
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Government information and archives
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Government information and archives
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/584/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr584/BILLS-112hr584ih.pdf |