US HB144 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 186-9)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Paperwork Mandate Elimination Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal a provision (added by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act) that extends to corporations that are not tax-exempt the requirement to report payments of $600 or more.
Title
Small Business Paperwork Mandate Elimination Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Same As) 2011-04-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-9.
HB60 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB18 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB72 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB584 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
HB60 (Related) 2011-01-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB18 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB72 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB584 (Related) 2011-02-09 - Referred to House Appropriations
Subjects
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Corporate finance and management
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/144/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr144/BILLS-112hr144ih.pdf |