US HB5826 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974, the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, and title XI of the Social Security Act to prevent certain cases of out-of-network surprise medical bills, strengthen health care consumer protections, and improve health care information transparency, and for other purposes.
Title
Consumer Protections Against Surprise Medical Bills Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5192 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5807 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5809 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5816 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5817 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5121 (Related) 2019-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5807 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5809 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5816 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5817 (Related) 2020-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5121 (Related) 2019-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Business records
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Inflation and prices
Licensing and registrations
User charges and fees
Women's health
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Business records
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Inflation and prices
Licensing and registrations
User charges and fees
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5826/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5826/BILLS-116hr5826ih.pdf |