US HB5817 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate Privacy Notice Confusion Act - Amends the Gramm-Leach-Bliley Act to exempt from its annual privacy policy notice requirement any financial institution which: (1) provides nonpublic personal information only in accordance with specified requirements, and (2) has not changed its policies and practices with regard to disclosing nonpublic personal information from those disclosed in the most recent disclosure sent to consumers.
Title
Eliminate Privacy Notice Confusion Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2012-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6723) |
2012-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5817. |
2012-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6723-6724) |
2012-12-12 | House | Mrs. Capito moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-12-05 | House | ORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mrs. Capito asked unanimous consent to withdraw her motion to suspend the rules and pass H.R. 5817. Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H6656) |
2012-12-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5817. |
2012-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2012-12-03 | House | Mrs. Capito moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit. |
2012-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1697 (Related) 2011-11-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB1600 (Related) 2011-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1600 (Related) 2011-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Finance and financial sector
Right of privacy
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Finance and financial sector
Right of privacy