US HB5785 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-08 - Became Public Law No: 114-251.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-08 - Became Public Law No: 114-251.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for an annuity supplement for certain air traffic controllers. This bill exempts retired air traffic controllers from a reduction to their Federal Employees Retirement System annuity supplement (on account of their earnings for work performed while entitled to the annuity after their separation from federal service) during any period in which they are employed full time as air traffic control instructors under contract with the Federal Aviation Administration.
Title
To amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for an annuity supplement for certain air traffic controllers.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Roll Calls
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 4 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 4 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 399 N: 4 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-251. |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6575) |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 4 (Roll no. 522). (text: CR H5662) |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5694-5695) |
2016-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5785. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5662-5663) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 598. |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-765. |
2016-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Department of Transportation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees