US HB5768 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-27 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-27 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Attorney General to establish a grant program to establish, create, and administer the violent incident clearance and technology investigative method, and for other purposes.
Title
VICTIM Act of 2022 Violent Incident Clearance and Technological Investigative Methods Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-22 - House - On passage (Y: 250 N: 178 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-09-22 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-22 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 250 - 178 (Roll no. 454). (text: CR H8096-8097) |
2022-09-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8103-8104) |
2022-09-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 30 minutes of debate on H.R. 5768. |
2022-09-22 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4118, H.R. 5768, H.R. 6448 and H.R. 8542. Resolution provides for 30 minutes of general debate with one motion to recommit for each bill. |
2022-09-22 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1377. (consideration: CR H8096-8100) |
2022-09-21 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1377 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4118, H.R. 5768, H.R. 6448 and H.R. 8542. Resolution provides for 30 minutes of general debate with one motion to recommit for each bill. |
2022-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 345. |
2022-07-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-441. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 14. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4402 (Related) 2022-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR1377 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1377 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.