US HB5751 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Golden Spike 150th Anniversary Act
Title
Golden Spike 150th Anniversary Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5591-5592) |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5751. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5591-5593) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 608. |
2018-06-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-782. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-06 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2831 (Same As) 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 655.