US HB5716 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMPASS Act Commit to Opioid Medical Prescriber Accountability and Safety for Seniors Act This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to identify outlier prescribers of opioids under the Medicare prescription drug benefit and Medicare Advantage prescription drug plans. Specifically, the CMS must: (1) establish an opioid-prescription threshold for determining whether a prescriber is an outlier compared to other prescribers, based on specialty and geographic area; (2) use National Provider Identifiers (unique provider identification numbers currently included on claims for covered drugs) to identify outlier prescribers; and (3) annually notify identified outlier prescribers of their status and provide them with resources on proper prescribing methods. The CMS may also identify and notify outlier prescribers based on co-prescriptions of covered drugs that have adverse effects when used in combination with opioids.
Title
COMPASS Act Commit to Opioid Medical Prescriber Accountability and Safety for Seniors Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574. |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-740, Part I. |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5773 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
SB2920 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
SB2920 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Medicare
Prescription drugs