US HB5708 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2016 (Sec. 3) This bill states that is U.S. policy to support: (1) the rule of law and an independent judiciary and electoral council in Nicaragua; (2) independent pro-democracy organizations in Nicaragua; and (3) free, fair, and transparent elections under international and domestic observers in Nicaragua in 2016 and 2017. (Sec. 4) The President shall instruct the U.S. executive director at each international financial institution to use U.S. influence to oppose any loan for the government of Nicaragua's benefit, other than for basic human needs or to promote democracy, unless the Department of State certifies that Nicaragua is taking effective steps to: (1) hold elections overseen by credible domestic and international electoral observers, (2) promote democracy and an independent judiciary system and electoral council, (3) strengthen the rule of law, and (4) respect the right to freedom of association and expression. The Department of the Treasury shall submit a report assessing: (1) the effectiveness of international financial institutions in enforcing applicable program safeguards in Nicaragua, and (2) the effects of specified election and fiscal transparency matters in Nicaragua on long-term prospects for positive development outcomes there. (Sec. 5) The President shall direct the U.S. Permanent Representative to the Organization of American States to use U.S. influence to advocate for an Electoral Observation Mission to be sent to Nicaragua in 2016 and 2017. (Sec. 6) The bill provides that Department of State and the U.S. Agency for International Development should prioritize foreign assistance to the people of Nicaragua to assist civil society in democracy and governance programs, including human rights documentation. (Sec. 7) The State Department shall report on the involvement of senior Nicaraguan government officials, including members of the Supreme Electoral Council, the National Assembly, and the judicial system, in acts of public corruption or human rights violations in Nicaragua.
Title
Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] |
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2016-09-21 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | H.Amdt.1427 On agreeing to the Royce amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | H.Amdt.1427 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Royce. (consideration: CR H5780-5782; text of amendment in nature of a substitute: CR H5780-5782) |
2016-09-21 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5779-5782; text of measure as introduced: CR H5779-5780) |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2016-09-21 | House | Mr. Royce asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2016-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Nicaragua
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Nicaragua
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status