US HB5665 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish in the Department of State the Office to Monitor and Combat Islamophobia, and for other purposes.
Title
Combating International Islamophobia Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - On passage (Y: 219 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2021-12-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-14 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 212 (Roll no. 448). (text: CR H7815-7816) |
2021-12-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7815-7816) |
2021-12-14 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5665, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McCaul demaneded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced. |
2021-12-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-12-14 | House | DEBATE - The House continued with further debate on H.R. 5665. |
2021-12-14 | House | WORDS TAKEN DOWN - During the course of debate, exception was taken to certain words used and a demand was made to have the words taken down. After review, the Chair ruled that the words were in violation of the spirit of debate. |
2021-12-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5665. |
2021-12-14 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5665 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2021-12-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 849. (consideration: CR H7794-7803) |
2021-12-14 | House | Rule H. Res. 849 passed House. (CR H7665-7666) |
2021-12-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 849 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5665 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2021-12-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 156. |
2021-12-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 117-215. |
2021-12-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 16. |
2021-12-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6204 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HR849 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3384 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR849 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3384 (Related) 2021-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.