US HB5659 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Volcker Rule Relief Act of 2018 This bill amends the Bank Holding Company Act of 1956 to exempt from the "Volcker Rule" banks with: (1) total assets valued at less than $10 billion, and (2) trading assets and liabilities comprising not more than 5% of total assets. (The Volcker Rule prohibits banking agencies from engaging in proprietary trading or entering into certain relationships with hedge funds and private-equity funds.)
Title
Volcker Rule Relief Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4790 (Related) 2018-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6147 (Related) 2018-09-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5659/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5659/BILLS-115hr5659ih.pdf |