US HB5645 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Standard Merger and Acquisition Reviews Through Equal Rules Act of 2018
Title
Standard Merger and Acquisition Reviews Through Equal Rules Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 176 (Y: 193 N: 220 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - On passage RC# 177 (Y: 230 N: 185 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - On passage RC# 177 (Y: 230 N: 185 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-05-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-09 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 185 (Roll no. 177). |
2018-05-09 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 193 - 220 (Roll no. 176). |
2018-05-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3865-3866) |
2018-05-09 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Doggett motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Doggett demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption until later in the legislative day. |
2018-05-09 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2018-05-09 | House | Floor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Doggett motion to recommit. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the bill back to the House forthwith with an amendment to add a section relating to protecting consumers against high prescription drug costs. |
2018-05-09 | House | Mr. Doggett moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H3857) |
2018-05-09 | House | H.Amdt.577 On agreeing to the Goodlatte amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | H.Amdt.577 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A001) without objection. |
2018-05-09 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 872, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Goodlatte amendment No. 1. |
2018-05-09 | House | H.Amdt.577 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Goodlatte. (consideration: CR H3855-3856; text: CR H3855) |
2018-05-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5645. |
2018-05-09 | House | ORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. Goodlattte asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting the amendment to H.R. 5645 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-09 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645, H.R. 2152 and S.J. Res. 57. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645 under a structured rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2152 under a closed rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 57 under a closed rule with one motion to commit. |
2018-05-09 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 872. (consideration: CR H5645; text of measure as reported in House: CR H3851) |
2018-05-07 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 872 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645, H.R. 2152 and S.J. Res. 57. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5645 under a structured rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2152 under a closed rule, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 57 under a closed rule with one motion to commit. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB659 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 304.
HR872 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2857 (Related) 2018-09-10 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
SB2847 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR872 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2857 (Related) 2018-09-10 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
SB2847 (Related) 2018-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Corporate finance and management
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Securities
Competition and antitrust
Corporate finance and management
Federal district courts
Jurisdiction and venue
Securities