US SB2857 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Nordic Museum Act (Sec. 3) This bill designates the Nordic Museum at 2655 N.W. Market Street in Seattle, Washington, as the "National Nordic Museum."
Title
National Nordic Museum Act
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 182. |
2018-09-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-931. |
2018-09-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-05 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-07-16 | House | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-303. |
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-06-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3264; text: CR S3264) |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB659 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 304.
HB5645 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5645 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Denmark
Europe
Finland
Historical and cultural resources
Iceland
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Norway
Sweden
U.S. history
Washington State
Denmark
Europe
Finland
Historical and cultural resources
Iceland
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Norway
Sweden
U.S. history
Washington State