US HB5636 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act
Title
Flatside Wilderness Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S8025) |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8025) |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
2018-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9479) |
2018-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5636. |
2018-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9478-9479) |
2018-11-13 | House | Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-10-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 772. |
2018-10-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-989. |
2018-09-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-26 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arkansas
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats