US HB5625 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing Government Travel Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the General Services Administration (GSA) to prescribe regulations to provide for the reimbursement of federal employees traveling on official business for the use of a transportation network company or innovative mobility technology. The Administrative Office of the United States Courts shall prescribe such regulations with respect to judicial branch employees. An "innovative mobility technology company" is an entity that applies technology to expand and enhance available transportation choices, better manage demand for transportation services, and provide alternatives to driving alone. A "transportation network company" is an entity that uses a digital network to connect riders to drivers affiliated with such entity in order for a driver to provide transportation services to a rider. (Sec. 3) The bill revises the reporting requirements regarding payments pertaining to official travel. By November 31 of each year, each agency shall submit to the GSA, in a format prescribed by it and approved by the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), an analysis of the total costs of transportation service by type and the total number of trips utilizing each transportation type for purposes of official travel. The GSA shall make the data submitted publicly available upon receipt. By January 31 of each year, the GSA shall submit to the OMB and to specified congressional committees: (1) an analysis of the data submitted for specified agencies (as listed under a provision regarding the establishment of agency Chief Financial Officers), and (2) a description of any new regulations promulgated or changes to existing regulations authorized.
Title
Modernizing Government Travel Act
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. John Carney [D-DE] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-09-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 549). (text: CR 09/20/2016 H5666-5667) |
2016-09-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5838-5839) |
2016-09-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5625. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5666-5668) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Carter (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 599. |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-766. |
2016-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2016-07-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commuting
Congressional oversight
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Transportation costs
Commuting
Congressional oversight
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Transportation costs