US HB5609 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946, to establish a cattle contract library, and for other purposes.
Title
Cattle Contract Library Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 411 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
2021-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 13 (Roll no. 409). (text: CR H7487-7488) |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7530-7531) |
2021-12-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5609. |
2021-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7487-7490) |
2021-12-08 | House | Mr. Scott, David moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 145. |
2021-12-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 117-203. |
2021-10-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-10-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-10-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3766 (Related) 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SB543 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB3229 (Related) 2021-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB543 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB3229 (Related) 2021-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.