US SB3229 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946 to establish a cattle contract library, and for other purposes.
Title
Cattle Price Discovery and Transparency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3766 (Related) 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
HB5609 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB5992 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SB543 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB5609 (Related) 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB5992 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SB543 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3229/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3229/BILLS-117s3229is.pdf |