US HB560 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-11)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safe Prisons Communications Act of 2009 - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to authorize the director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons or the chief executive officer of a state to petition the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to permit the installation of devices to prevent, jam, or interfere with wireless communications within the geographic boundaries of a specific prison, penitentiary, or correctional facility under his or her jurisdiction. Requires that the device be operated on a directional basis, using all other interference-limiting capabilities available to the device, or otherwise so that the device does not interfere with wireless communications that originate and terminate outside the area of the prison, penitentiary, or correctional facility. Requires the FCC to adopt a final rule establishing criteria for certification for the manufacture, sale, importation, and interstate shipment of such devices.
Title
Safe Prisons Communications Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-01-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet. | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB251 (Same As) 2009-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/560/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr560/BILLS-111hr560ih.pdf |