US HB5577 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 219-32)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Became Public Law No: 117-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 219-32)
Status: Passed on October 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Became Public Law No: 117-184.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3900 Crown Road Southwest in Atlanta, Georgia, as the "John R. Lewis Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3900 Crown Road Southwest in Atlanta, Georgia, as the "John R. Lewis Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 421 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-04 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-184. |
2022-10-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-09-28 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4876; text: CR S4876) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-02-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-02-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0, 1 Present (Roll no. 15). (text: CR H312) |
2022-02-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H324-325) |
2022-02-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-02-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5577. |
2022-02-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H312-315) |
2022-02-01 | House | Ms. Wasserman Schultz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-12-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-12-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3033 (Same As) 2021-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.