US HB5576 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cyber Deterrence and Response Act of 2018
Title
Cyber Deterrence and Response Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-09-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7843-7845) |
2018-09-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5576. |
2018-09-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7843-7848) |
2018-09-05 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-28 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3378 (Related) 2018-08-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computer security and identity theft
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Financial crises and stabilization
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Travel and tourism
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
Computer security and identity theft
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Financial crises and stabilization
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Travel and tourism
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports