US HB5534 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-27)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2019 This bill indefinitely extends Medicare coverage of immunosuppressive drugs for kidney transplant recipients for individuals who do not have other coverage. Under current law, Medicare coverage is limited to 36 months following a transplant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]
Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-01-08HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-12-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-12-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-12-23HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-12-23HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback