US HB5534 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GUIDE Compliance Act Give Useful Information to Define Effective Compliance Act This bill amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 to require certain procedures for guidance issued by the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau.
Title
GUIDE Compliance Act Give Useful Information to Define Effective Compliance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 847. |
2018-12-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-1095. |
2018-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 38 - 14. |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3443 (Related) 2018-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Civil actions and liability
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives