US HB5528 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To evaluate the impact of the lowest price technically acceptable source selection process on national security, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe and Smart Federal Purchasing Act of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 20 (Y: 397 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2024-01-30SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2024-01-29HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2024-01-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-01-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 0 (Roll no. 20). (text: CR H257-258)
2024-01-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H265-266)
2024-01-29HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2024-01-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5528.
2024-01-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H257-258)
2024-01-29HouseMr. Donalds moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2023-09-20HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0.
2023-09-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-09-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
2023-09-18HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback