US HB5526 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 6.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to clarify the application of the in-office ancillary services exception to the physician self-referral prohibition for drugs furnished under the Medicare program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seniors’ Access to Critical Medications Act of 2023

Sponsors

Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC]
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI]
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX]Rep. Nikki Budzinski [D-IL]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Jeff Jackson [D-NC]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY]Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY]Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY]
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]
Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-12HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 6.
2024-03-12HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-09-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2023-09-18HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-09-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3458 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback