US HB5492 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3434)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3434)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maternal Opioid Treatment, Health, Education, and Recovery Act of 2018
Title
Maternal Opioid Treatment, Health, Education, and Recovery Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3434) |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2680 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 398.
SB2710 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2323)
SB2710 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2323)
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical education
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
Congressional oversight
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical education
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5492/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5492/BILLS-115hr5492ih.pdf |