US HB5443 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a policy regarding appraisal and valuation services for real property for a transaction over which the Secretary of the Interior has jurisdiction, and for other purposes.
Title
Accelerating Appraisals and Conservation Efforts Act
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. James Moylan [R-GU] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-09-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-09-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5443/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5443/BILLS-118hr5443ih.pdf |