US HB5418 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Affairs Medical-Surgical Purchasing Stabilization Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), in procuring medical, surgical, dental, or laboratory items for VA medical facilities through the Medical Surgical Prime Vendor (MSPV) program, to: (1) award contracts to multiple regional prime vendors instead of a single nationwide prime vendor, and (2) prohibit a prime vendor from solely designing the formulary of items available for MSPV purchase. The VA shall: (1) ensure that each VA employee who conducts formulary analyses or makes decisions about including items on the formulary has relevant medical expertise, and (2) provide Congress with periodic lists of such individuals and their medical expertise listed by categories of formulary items.
Title
Veterans Affairs Medical-Surgical Purchasing Stabilization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4257) |
2018-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5418. |
2018-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4257-4258) |
2018-05-21 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536. |
2018-05-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-693. |
2018-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Public contracts and procurement
Surgery and anesthesia
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Public contracts and procurement
Surgery and anesthesia
Veterans' medical care