US HB5393 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure fair assessment of pharmacy performance and quality under Medicare part D, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure fair assessment of pharmacy performance and quality under Medicare part D, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-09-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-09-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5393/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5393/BILLS-118hr5393ih.pdf |