US HB5368 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit through December 31, 2024, the imposition of a mask mandate on passengers of air carriers or public transit and in educational settings within the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Freedom to Breathe Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Mike Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. George Santos [R-NY] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2023-09-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-09-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2738 (Same As) 2023-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5368/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5368/BILLS-118hr5368ih.pdf |