US HB535 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PFAS Action Act of 2019 This bill requires the Environmental Protection Agency to designate all perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances as hazardous substances within one year of enactment of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PFAS Action Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB638 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1599)
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback