US HB5345 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ALSTAR Act American Leadership in Space Technology and Advanced Rocketry Act
Title
ALSTAR Act American Leadership in Space Technology and Advanced Rocketry Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-06-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text; CR H5769) |
2018-06-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5345. |
2018-06-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5769-5770) |
2018-06-27 | House | Mr. Brooks (AL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-03-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |