US HB5338 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of State to work with the private sector, the United Nations, and other relevant multilateral organizations to address childhood cancer globally.
Title
Global Hope Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-01-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H588-589) |
2020-01-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5338. |
2020-01-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H588-590) |
2020-01-28 | House | Mr. Phillips moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cancer
Child health
Congressional oversight
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Multilateral development programs
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
World health
Child health
Congressional oversight
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Multilateral development programs
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
World health