US HB533 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Tibetan Policy Act of 2002 to modify certain provisions of that Act.
Title
Promoting a Resolution to the Tibet-China Dispute Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 53 (Y: 392 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2024-02-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-02-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 28 (Roll no. 53). (text: 2/13/2024 CR H555-556) |
2024-02-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 28 (Roll no. 53). |
2024-02-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H661-662) |
2024-02-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-02-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 533. |
2024-02-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H555-558) |
2024-02-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-02-13 | House | Mrs. Kim (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-11-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB138 (Related) 2024-04-16 - Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.