US HB5317 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs health care center in Center Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Abie Abraham VA Clinic". (Sec. 2) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs health care center in Center Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Abie Abraham VA Clinic."
Title
To designate the Department of Veterans Affairs health care center in Center Township, Butler County, Pennsylvania, as the "Abie Abraham VA Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] |
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-06-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4008) |
2016-06-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5317. |
2016-06-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4008-4010) |
2016-06-21 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Pennsylvania
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Pennsylvania
Veterans' medical care