US HB5309 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

CROWN Act of 2020 Creating a Respectful and Open World for Natural Hair Act of 2020 This bill prohibits discrimination based on a person's hair texture or hairstyle if that style or texture is commonly associated with a particular race or national origin. Specifically, the bill prohibits this type of discrimination against those participating in federally assisted programs, housing programs, public accommodations, and employment. Persons shall not be deprived of equal rights under the law and shall not be subjected to prohibited practices based on their hair texture or style. The bill provides for enforcement procedures under the applicable laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CROWN Act of 2020 Creating a Respectful and Open World for Natural Hair Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2020-09-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4592-4594)
2020-09-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5309.
2020-09-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4592-4597)
2020-09-21HouseMs. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-09-21HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 425.
2020-09-21HouseCommittee on Education and Labor discharged.
2020-09-21HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-525, Part I.
2020-09-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-09-14HouseSubcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Discharged.
2020-01-30HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-12-05HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-12-05HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-12-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3167 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback