US HB5302 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Air and Marine Operations Marine Unit of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection located at 101 Km 18.5 in Cabo Rojo, Puerto Rico, as the "Michel O. Maceda Marine Unit".
Title
Michel O. Maceda Memorial Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Ernest Gonzales [R-TX] |
Rep. James Moylan [R-GU] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Morgan Luttrell [R-TX] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450. |
2024-06-07 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2024-06-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 118-542, Part I. |
2024-04-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-04-10 | House | Subcommittee on Border Security and Enforcement Discharged |
2023-08-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security and Enforcement. |
2023-08-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-08-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3181 (Same As) 2023-11-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.