US HB5301 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title 31, United States Code, to require agencies to include a list of outdated or duplicative reporting requirements in annual budget justifications, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate Useless Reports Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-07HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0.
2024-03-07HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-02-06HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2024-02-06HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2023-08-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2023-08-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2073 (Related) 2024-05-07 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback