US HB530 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SECURE Our Democracy Act Safeguard our Elections and Combat Unlawful Interference in Our Democracy Act This bill directs the Department of State to submit within 120 days a list of each foreign person that: (1) was at any time since January 1, 2015, involved in actions to unlawfully access, disrupt, misappropriate, influence, or alter information related to U.S. political parties, federal election candidates, or the administration of federal elections; or (2) worked or acted as an agent or instrumentality of, or on behalf of, or that was otherwise associated with, such foreign person. The unclassified portion of such list shall be made available to the public and published in the Federal Register. A listed alien shall be ineligible to receive a U.S. entry visa, and any current visa shall be revoked. Such prohibitions shall also apply to an alien who is an official of, an agent or instrumentality of, or working or acting on behalf of, a listed foreign entity or government if such alien knowingly authorized, conspired to commit, was responsible for, engaged in, or otherwise assisted or facilitated such prohibited actions. The President, through the Department of the Treasury, shall: (1) freeze and prohibit a listed foreign person's transactions in property and property interests that are in the United States or controlled a U.S. person, and (2) require each financial institution that is a U.S. person and has within its possession or control such property or property interests to certify that it has frozen all such assets.
Title
SECURE Our Democracy Act Safeguard our Elections and Combat Unlawful Interference in Our Democracy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6494 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Subversive activities
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Subversive activities
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/530/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr530/BILLS-115hr530ih.pdf |