US HB528 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recreational Fishing and Hunting Heritage and Opportunities Act Requires federal public land management officials to facilitate the use of, and access to, federal public lands for fishing, sport hunting, and recreational shooting with specified exceptions. Requires Bureau of Land Management (BLM) and Forest Service lands, excluding lands on the Outer Continental Shelf, to be open to recreational fishing, hunting, and shooting unless the managing agency acts to close such lands to such activity for purposes of resource conservation, public safety, energy production, water supply facilities, or national security. Requires the heads of federal agencies to use their authorities to lease their lands or permit use of their lands for shooting ranges, and designate specific lands for recreational shooting activities. Sets forth requirements for a permanent or temporary withdrawal, change of classification, or change of management status that effectively closes or significantly restricts 640 or more contiguous acres of federal public lands for fishing or hunting or related activities.
Title
Recreational Fishing and Hunting Heritage and Opportunities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2406 (Related) 2016-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Firearms and explosives
Forests, forestry, trees
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Firearms and explosives
Forests, forestry, trees
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/528/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr528/BILLS-114hr528ih.pdf |