US HB5257 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secure Communities and Safe Schools Act This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to prohibit the use of a grant awarded under the Urban Areas Security Initiative or the State Homeland Security Grant Program to purchase firearms and firearms accessories, such as ammunition, including for use by teachers.
Title
Secure Communities and Safe Schools Act
Sponsors
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2018-03-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1550) |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6920 (Related) 2018-10-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Subjects
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Homeland security
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Emergency management
Firearms and explosives
Homeland security
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5257/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5257/BILLS-115hr5257ih.pdf |