US HB521 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - Became Public Law No: 117-225.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - Became Public Law No: 117-225.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To permit disabled law enforcement officers, customs and border protection officers, firefighters, air traffic controllers, nuclear materials couriers, members of the Capitol Police, members of the Supreme Court Police, employees of the Central Intelligence Agency performing intelligence activities abroad or having specialized security requirements, and diplomatic security special agents of the Department of State to receive retirement benefits in the same manner as if they had not been disabled.
Title
First Responder Fair RETIRE Act First Responder Fair Return for Employees on Their Initial Retirement Earned Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 417 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-225. |
2022-12-09 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6802; text: CR S6802) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 515. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-173. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-07-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 301). (text: CR H5955-5957) |
2022-07-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5968-5969) |
2022-07-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-07-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 521. |
2022-07-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5955-5959) |
2022-07-12 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-05-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB129 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.