US HB5206 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 717.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

OBIM Authorization Act of 2018 Office of Biometric Identity Management Authorization Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish within the Management Directorate of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) the Office of Biometric Identity Management, which shall be administered by a director with significant management experience and experience in biometrics and identity management. The director shall have specified duties, including leading DHS's biometric identity services to support anti-terrorism, counterterrorism, border security, credentialing, national security, and public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OBIM Authorization Act of 2018 Office of Biometric Identity Management Authorization Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 717.
2018-12-04SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-413.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2018-06-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-06-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-06-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5632)
2018-06-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5206.
2018-06-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5632-5633)
2018-06-25HouseMs. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-06-21HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 599.
2018-06-21HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-773.
2018-06-06HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-06-06HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-06-06HouseSubcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Discharged.
2018-03-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
2018-03-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2018-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback