US HB5203 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Commission Reform Act - Modifies the membership of the Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Commission. Requires each appointment to the Commission to be made in consultation with the Eisenhower Foundation, a public foundation located in Abilene, Kansas. Terminates the membership of the present Commission on the date of enactment of this Act.
Title
Dwight D. Eisenhower Memorial Commission Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-705. |
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1126 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Subjects
Executive agency funding and structure
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers